U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thrasher
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • July 20, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • July 20, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • July 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • April 28, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • April 28, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.