U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Radeke
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • September 27, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • September 27, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • September 27, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • June 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Disclosure of Rule 16 & Brady Materials]
  • May 19, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 29, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.