U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roderick
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • June 18, 2021: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.