U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cm-80223-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McNeal
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Violation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention (Oral)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • December 19, 2022: [Detention (Oral)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • September 14, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
  • April 26, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • April 26, 2022: [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • March 28, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.