U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-po-05057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zorn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • June 11, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • June 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • May 12, 2021: [Certified Mail Receipt Returned]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 12, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Sealed Document-use ONLY with other selection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.