U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mack
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.