U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Greene
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Revocation Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2022: [Violation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • October 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Violation Report]
  • October 04, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2022: [Prob 12C PUBLIC Petition/Order for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • June 27, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 13, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 11, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 10, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • January 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 23, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • May 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.