U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moss
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Time to Pay Assessment and Fine]
  • August 24, 2021: [Additional Time to Pay Assessment and Fine]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 20, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 02, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • May 17, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 17, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.