U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonde
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 02, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Sealed Document-use ONLY with other selection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.