U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Henderson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • October 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • October 01, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • October 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Proceed in Absentia]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proceed in Absentia]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • June 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • May 17, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 17, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.