U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Geisel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • June 10, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • June 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • May 17, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • May 17, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.