U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-00207
  • Case Name: Morales v. Trinity Services Group, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 07, 2021: [Stipulation]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 21, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Compel]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.