U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-00206
  • Case Name: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Integrity Advance, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [SEALED Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Answer to Application for Writ of Garnishment]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order]
  • September 26, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2022: [Quash]
  • April 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • April 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 15, 2022: [Quash]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 24, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 08, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • July 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • July 07, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 16, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • June 11, 2021: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • June 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • May 19, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Enforce]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.