U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arreola Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Case]
  • May 27, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • May 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • May 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice - Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 20, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • May 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.