U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mc-00102
  • Case Name: Stuart C. Irby Company v. Music City Electric Corp. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Show Cause]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Application for Writ of Garnishment]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.