U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90034-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dodd
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 08, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 08, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.