U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zuniga
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 09, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • August 06, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 09, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 09, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 09, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.