U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melville
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 10, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 09, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 09, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.