U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jeffries
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 23, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • August 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 09, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 09, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.