U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ocelot et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • September 29, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • September 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 29, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • July 06, 2021: [Mail Returned]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 11, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 11, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.