U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Murray
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • October 12, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • October 12, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • July 27, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 11, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 11, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.