U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stanley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • July 27, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • July 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • June 11, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • June 11, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.