U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • January 24, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • January 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • January 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Mail Returned]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 07, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.