U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Feuerborn
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution]
  • December 06, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • August 17, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 07, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.