U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clemente
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • November 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 06, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 07, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.