U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mills
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • February 15, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • August 06, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • July 15, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 15, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.