U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mc-00210
  • Case Name: ARC LPW I, LLC v. KLMKH, Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Assignment of Judgment]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Praecipe]
  • December 14, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Application for Writ]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Application for Writ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • July 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.