U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-70045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marasco
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • August 16, 2021: [Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
  • August 16, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • August 16, 2021: [Deferral of Prosecution Allowed]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 26, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 26, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.