U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godfrey
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 16, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 12, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • July 26, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • July 26, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.