U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arbgast
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • September 27, 2021: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 02, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 02, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.