U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Barbosa
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • September 24, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 20, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 02, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 02, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.