U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sodetz
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • March 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • March 09, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • March 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • March 09, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.