U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frazier
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Mail Returned]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • November 10, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arraignment - Petty Offense]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 04, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 04, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.