U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mc-00103
  • Case Name: National Credit Union Administration Board v. Knight
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Return of Service]
  • August 23, 2021: [Show Cause]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 04, 2021: [Enforce]
  • August 04, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.