U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mj-06131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arnett
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 20, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 12, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 12, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2021: [Waiver]
  • August 04, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • August 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 04, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5(c)(3) Out]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.