U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-05083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Krainbill
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 26, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 26, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 25, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 25, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • August 20, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.