U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • September 14, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.