U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • October 22, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.