U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:12-cm-60009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gooch
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Answer to Application for Writ of Continuting Garnishment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Garnishee Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Garnishee Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Answer to Application for Writ of Continuting Garnishment]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • August 23, 2021: [Entry of Appearance by USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.