U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stevens
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 12, 2021: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.