U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70051-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Singleton
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Additional Time to Pay Assessment and Fine]
  • March 08, 2022: [Additional Time to Pay Assessment and Fine]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • November 10, 2021: [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • October 27, 2021: [Docket Call]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.