U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wideman
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • April 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • April 13, 2022: [Arraignment]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • November 09, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.