U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-po-90054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ernst
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Cancelled Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
  • October 12, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 23, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 23, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.