U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mj-06147-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Strom
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.