U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-mc-00104
  • Case Name: Wagner Aeronautical, Inc. et al. v. National Institute for Aviation Research et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • September 30, 2021: [Exhibits]
  • September 30, 2021: [Surreply]
  • September 30, 2021: [Leave]
  • September 21, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid]
  • September 17, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Service]
  • September 07, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 26, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 25, 2021: [Reassigning Case]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 24, 2021: [Enforce]
  • August 24, 2021: [Hearing]
  • August 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Case Initiating Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.