U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gamboa-Saenz, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2021: [Receipt for Passport - Surrendered]
  • September 20, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 17, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 15, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • September 15, 2021: [Revoke]
  • September 13, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Receipt for Passport - Surrendered]
  • September 10, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Arrest]
  • September 01, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • August 31, 2021: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 30, 2021: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 30, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • August 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order re: Due Process Protections Act]
  • August 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 27, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 27, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.