U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Mail Returned]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • August 30, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • August 30, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.