U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90061-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Phillips
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 22, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 22, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge-Misdemeanor Case]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 01, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 01, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.