U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: B:21-mj-90060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parkes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Consent to Appear by Video or Telephone - CARES Act]
  • April 13, 2022: [Dismiss Complaint/Case]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Speedy Trial/Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • September 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
  • September 01, 2021: [Violation Notice/Ticket]
  • September 01, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.