U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-po-70059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kelly
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Judgment - Petty Offense]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • June 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 28, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • May 11, 2022: [Docket Call]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • February 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
  • February 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • December 08, 2021: [Docket Call]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
  • November 12, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing - Fort Leavenworth]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 13, 2021: [Docket Call]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.